Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Girolamo Naselli

Deceased

Bishop of Luni e Sarzana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1640³BornSavone
10 Sep 168544.6AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
29 Sep 168544.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
7 Feb 169554.1AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
Aug 1709³68.5DiedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Girolamo Naselli:
Bishop Giovanni Girolamo Naselli (born , died Aug 1709) Bishop of Luni e Sarzana

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250, and Page 409
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 29
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015