Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico Moroli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1600BornSan Quintius de Camerino
13 Jan 164241.4AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
26 Jan 164241.4Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
1649²48.4DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Moroli:
Bishop Giovanni Domenico Moroli O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1642, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015