Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Morari

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹Born
1614²32.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 163250.7AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
10 Oct 163250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
1652²70.0DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Morari (VIAF: 62442550)
Bishop Pietro Morari (born 1582, died 1652) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChioggia
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 212
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,895
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 31
  • ob/c2: AT, 3 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,996

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast