Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ettore Molza

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1655AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
8 Aug 1655Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
11 May 1679DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ettore Molza
Bishop Ettore Molza (died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 19
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast