Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Riccardo Capece Minutolo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1746BornNapoli
18 Jun 176923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Oct 179751.7SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
18 Dec 179751.8ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
21 Dec 179751.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
3 Sep 180155.5DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Riccardo Capece Minutolo
Bishop Riccardo Capece Minutolo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016