Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Meschatin

Deceased

Bishop of Gap, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1637³Born
17 Sep 167538.2SelectedBishop of Gap, France
24 May 167739.8ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
8 Aug 167740.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
20 Feb 167941.6DiedBishop of Gap, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Meschatin
Bishop Guillaume de Meschatin (born Jul 1637, died ) Bishop of Gap

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTheneville

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 404
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1677, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018