Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charbel Georges Merhi, M.L.

Bishop Emeritus of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1937 Born
29 Aug 196426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Lebanese Maronite Missionaries (Maronite)
5 Oct 199052.9AppointedBishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina
2 Dec 199053.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina
17 Mar 199153.4InstalledBishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina
17 Apr 201375.5RetiredBishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Charbel Georges Merhi
Bishop Charbel Georges Merhi M.L. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Charbel en Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEddé

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,434
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast