Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vittorio Filippo Melano di Portula, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1733³BornCuneo
18 Sep 175622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Mar 177844.4SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
1 Jun 177844.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
21 Jun 177844.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
14 Jun 179763.7SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
24 Jul 179763.8ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
23 Dec 181380.2DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Filippo Melano di Portula
Archbishop Vittorio Filippo Melano di Portula O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 140, and Page 315
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,700
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016