Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Massimi

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
24 Nov 163240.8AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
2 Jan 163341.0Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
28 Oct 164755.8DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Massimi
Bishop Lorenzo Massimi (born 1592, died ) Bishop of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSant'Egidio in Trastevere, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria delle Grazie, Cathedral, Pescina, Diocese of Marsi

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 33
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017