Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro José Manuel Martínez de Arizala, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pedro de la Trinidad)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1690BornMadrid, Spain
27 Dec 174353.4SelectedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
3 Feb 174453.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
21 Nov 174555.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
27 Aug 174757.1InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
28 May 175564.9DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Manuel Martínez de Arizala
Archbishop Pedro José Manuel Martínez de Arizala O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 64, Number 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Nov 2016