Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Romano Malingri

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1731Born
9 Jun 175927.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 177240.6SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
7 Sep 177240.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
6 Dec 177241.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
5 Aug 177644.7DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Romano Malingri
Archbishop Antonio Romano Malingri (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinerolo, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSan Filippo, Church, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 17.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,489
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 40
  • c2+: AT, 8 Aug 2017
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,472

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018