Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Magnesi

Deceased

Bishop of Ostuni


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1638AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
25 Apr 1638Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
9 Jan 1640AppointedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
Aug 1659³DiedBishop of Ostuni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio Magnesi:
Bishop Fabio Magnesi (died Aug 1659) Bishop of Ostuni

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 346, and Page 267
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 101, Number 610
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015