Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Macioti

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1775BornVellectri
22 Sep 179823.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 182852.8AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
6 Jul 182852.9Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
1 Feb 183660.5AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
5 Aug 184065.0DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Macioti:
Bishop Vincenzo Macioti (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1835
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 71, and Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013