Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Lozano González, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1622Born
24 Feb 164623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
15 Mar 167754.6SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
13 Sep 167755.1ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
19 Sep 167755.1Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
10 Sep 168159.1DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Lozano González
Bishop Diego Lozano González O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 216, Number 1,343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast