Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Le Tellier

Deceased

Bishop of Digne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1630Born
Jun 1657³26.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 167746.9SelectedBishop of Digne, France
28 Feb 167847.3ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
15 May 167847.5Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
11 Feb 170877.2DiedBishop of Digne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Le Tellier
Bishop François Le Tellier (born , died ) Bishop of Digne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018