Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrzej Leszczyński

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornGoluchˇw
18 Dec 163325.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 164133.9AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
15 Jun 164234.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
4 May 164638.3SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
3 Dec 164638.9ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
8 Jan 165345.0AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
15 Apr 165850.2DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Leszczyński:
Archbishop Andrzej Leszczyński (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 130, and Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 169
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,589
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1642, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015