Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Leone, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1677BornGiovinazzo
26 Jul 170023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
19 Jul 174568.0AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
25 Jul 174568.0Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
9 Jul 175477.0DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Leone:
Bishop Felice Leone O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • bp/c34: CB, 20 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014