Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Leoncillo

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1651AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
9 Jul 1651Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
1653¹DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Leoncillo (VIAF: 73446589)
Bishop Antonio Leoncillo (died 1653) Bishop of Termoli

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 334
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 31
  • ob/c2: AT, 28 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016