Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Sigmund von Kuenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1659BornGraz
15 Mar 168727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
22 Feb 170444.4SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
27 Mar 170444.5ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
6 Apr 170444.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
1 Apr 170848.5AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
25 Jul 170848.8InstalledBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
18 Nov 171152.1DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Sigmund von Kuenburg:
Bishop Johann Sigmund von Kuenburg (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157, and Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015