Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Krasovskyj (Krassowski)

Deceased

Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1776Born
Jul 1798³21.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 180932.7SelectedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
1811²34.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
13 Jan 181134.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
1823²46.0AppointedAdministrator of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
3 Feb 182649.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 Aug 182750.7DiedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Krasovskyj (Krassowski):
Archbishop Jan Krasovskyj (Krassowski) (born , died ) Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,777
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,461
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,134
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,964
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1811, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 267, and Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015