Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jozafat Bułhak, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1758Born
27 Mar 178527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
24 Apr 178729.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
26 Sep 179032.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
1 Sep 179335.4SucceededBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
1795²36.7ResignedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
12 Oct 179840.5AppointedBishop of Brėst (Ukrainian)
1814²55.7AppointedAdministrator of Vilno (Ukrainian), Lithuania
27 Jan 181758.8AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1818²59.7AppointedBishop of Vilno (Ukrainian), Lithuania
22 Sep 181860.5AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1828²69.7AppointedBishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
14 Apr 183375.0AppointedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
9 Mar 183879.9DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jozafat Bułhak:
Archbishop Jozafat Bułhak O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 338
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,911
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 258, and Page 259, and Page 280
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 287, and Page 294, and Page 306
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015