Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kyrylo Syrotynskyj

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1769¹Born
26 Nov 182354.9SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Nov 182354.9SelectedTitular Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
10 Feb 182556.1ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Feb 182556.1ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
27 Sep 182556.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
1828²59.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
1831²62.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kyrylo Syrotynskyj:
Bishop Kyrylo Syrotynskyj , Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,781
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 258, and Page 267, and Page 308
  • obd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015