Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico de Iorio (Jorio)

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Samaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1731³BornProcida, Italy
24 May 175524.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 178554.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
15 Jan 178654.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
9 May 180473.0DiedTitular Bishop of Samaria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico de Iorio (Jorio): VIAF:88895384
Bishop Domenico de Iorio (Jorio) (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Samaria

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 365
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016