Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Guardia

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1666BornNapoli
19 Sep 168822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 168923.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 171347.4SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
4 Feb 171548.6ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
10 Feb 171548.6Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
Oct 1718³52.2DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Guardia:
Bishop Michele Guardia (born , died Oct 1718) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 10 Jul 2015