Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Graziadei

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1696BornFerrara
21 Sep 172226.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 175154.8AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
25 Jul 175457.9DiedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Graziadei:
Bishop Ippolito Graziadei (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve

  • a priest for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1751, Number 26
  • ob/c2: ATh, 13 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015