Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Marco Gradenigo

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1589Born
22 Sep 162939.9AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
25 Sep 162939.9SucceededPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
2 Jan 163343.2Ordained BishopPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
16 Feb 165666.3DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Gradenigo
Patriarch Marco Gradenigo (born , died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSant'Egidio in Trastevere, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)Corpus Domini, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 90
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 27
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017