Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Antonio Gozzano

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640BornCasalen
30 Sep 167535.7AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
6 Oct 167535.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
11 Dec 172181.9DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Antonio Gozzano:
Bishop Carlo Antonio Gozzano (died ) Bishop of Acqui

  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013