Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Ferdinando de Gorizzutti

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621BornJalmico
165231.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien, Austria
5 Sep 167251.7SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
30 Jan 167352.1ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
28 May 167352.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
22 Sep 169170.7DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Ferdinando de Gorizzutti:
Bishop Giacomo Ferdinando de Gorizzutti (died ) Bishop of Trieste

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013