Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro González del Castillo

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1562BornGranada
17 Feb 161451.5AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
5 Aug 162765.0DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González del Castillo:
Bishop Pedro González del Castillo (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,824
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 128
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 130, Number 834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015