Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Cardinal von GoŽs (Goess)

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1612Born
5 Oct 167563.6SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
13 Dec 167563.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 167663.9ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
2 Feb 167663.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
2 Sep 168674.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Nov 168674.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
19 Oct 169684.6DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Johann von GoŽs (Goess) (VIAF: 5846244)
Johann Cardinal von GoŽs (Goess) (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrussels, Belgium
Ordained BishopHouse of the Professed Jesuits, Wien, Diocese of Wien

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die BischŲfe der Deutschsprachigen Lšnder
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,676, Number 1
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast