Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1585Born
9 Feb 162640.2AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
22 Feb 162640.2Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
24 Apr 165367.4DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Giustiniani
Bishop Bartolomeo Giustiniani (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios, Diocese of Chios (Scio), Greece
Ordained BishopSistine Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAvellino, Diocese of Avellino e Frigento

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 105
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 30
  • b/ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017