Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Giagia

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cipro (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1808BornBisciarre, Lebanon
26 Dec 184335.1AppointedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
26 Dec 184335.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
1878¹69.2ResignedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
10 Oct 188273.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giagia
Archbishop Giuseppe Giagia (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cipro

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,383
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Dec 2016