Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulysses Gherardini della Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornCetonae
1 Jul 162440.5AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
2 Jul 162440.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
9 Jan 167086.0DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ulysses Gherardini della Rosa:
Bishop Ulysses Gherardini della Rosa (died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 324
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 85, Number 505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013