Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Gizzio (Gessi, Giglio)

Deceased

Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1633AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
16 Jan 1633Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
2 May 1639AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
Aug 1642³DiedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Gizzio (Gessi, Giglio)
Bishop Bartolomeo Gizzio (Gessi, Giglio) (died Aug 1642) Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112, and Page 374
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 27
  • ob/c2: AT, 7 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Sep 2016