Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Uriel von Gemmingen-Michelfeld

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1468Born
27 Sep 150840.1SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Dec 150840.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
18 Mar 150940.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
9 Feb 151445.5DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Uriel von Gemmingen-Michelfeld (VIAF: 54944723)
Archbishop Uriel von Gemmingen-Michelfeld (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGermersheim

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 May 2018

Quantcast