Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Dalberg

Deceased

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1455BornOppenheim
9 Oct 148227.1AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
28 Jul 150347.9DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Dalberg (VIAF: 56762395)
Bishop Johann von Dalberg (born , died ) Bishop of Worms

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 4 Feb 2016