Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Berthold von Henneberg-Römhild

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1441¹Born
146423.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 148443.3SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Sep 148443.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
13 Mar 148544.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Dec 150463.9DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Berthold von Henneberg-Römhild (VIAF: 18015825)
Archbishop Berthold von Henneberg-Römhild (born 1441, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHartenberg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,403
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1485, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast