Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo von Hohenladenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1459¹BornHegi
7 May 149637.3SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
18 Jul 149637.5Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
29 Jul 149637.5ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
18 Dec 149637.9Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
5 Jan 152970.0ResignedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
Jun 153172.4SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
13 Sep 153172.6ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
7 Jan 153273.0DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugo von Hohenladenburg:
Bishop Hugo von Hohenladenburg (died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,431
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,313
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015