Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig von Helmstatt

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1435Born
5 Aug 147843.5SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
28 Sep 147843.7ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
13 Dec 147843.9Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
24 Aug 150469.6DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig von Helmstatt
Bishop Ludwig von Helmstatt (born 1435, died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 241
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018