Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dietrich Schenk von Erbach

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1396Born
6 Jul 143438.5SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Oct 143438.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
6 May 145963.3DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Dietrich Schenk von Erbach:
Archbishop Dietrich Schenk von Erbach (died ) Archbishop of Mainz

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013