Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Ruscher

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Venecompensis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
19 Dec 150252.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
19 Dec 150252.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Venecompensis
19 Mar 150353.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Venecompensis
13 Aug 151060.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ruscher (VIAF: 77115430)
Bishop Thomas Ruscher (born 1450, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwäbisch Gmünd
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Church, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz
Death PlaceMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 332
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 May 2018

Quantcast