Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp von Rosenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1461Born
6 Sep 150443.6SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
8 Nov 150443.8ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Feb 150544.1Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
4 Feb 151352.0DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp von Rosenberg:
Bishop Philipp von Rosenberg (died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a bishop for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015