Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Greiffenclau von Vollrads

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1467Born
15 May 151144.3SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
7 Jan 151245.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
29 May 151245.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
30 May 151245.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
13 Mar 153164.1DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Richard Greiffenclau von Vollrads
Archbishop Richard Greiffenclau von Vollrads (born 1467, died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVollrads

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018