Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolò Gatto

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1785Born
23 Sep 180924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Patti, Italy
21 Feb 182034.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
21 May 182034.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
25 Feb 182337.4SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
17 Nov 182338.1ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
31 Dec 183146.3DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicolò Gatto
Bishop Nicolò Gatto (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatti

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 295, and Page 371
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast