Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio García Balsalobre y Rada, O.S. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tanis

Titular See: (Prior of Ucles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1780BornTorrubia del Campo, Spain
30 Sep 183151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
15 Jan 183251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
3 Nov 184464.6DiedTitular Bishop of Tanis

MicroData Summary for José Antonio García Balsalobre y Rada:
Bishop José Antonio García Balsalobre y Rada O.S. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tanis

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,381
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013