Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard FitzJames

Deceased

Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Feb 1497AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
21 May 1497Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
29 Nov 1503AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 1506AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 1522DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard FitzJames:
Bishop Richard FitzJames (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 167, and Page 227
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 299, and Page 569
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 224
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013