Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Atwater

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1439¹Born
15 Sep 151475.7AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
12 Nov 151475.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
4 Feb 152182.1DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Atwater:
Bishop William Atwater (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013