Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henry Cardinal Beaufort

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1374¹BornMeuse-et-Loire, France
1 Jun 139824.4AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
14 Jul 139824.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
19 Nov 140430.9AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
24 May 142652.4Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 142652.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
11 Apr 144773.3DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry Beaufort:
Cardinal Henry Beaufort (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 48.7 years
  • a cardinal for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 530
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013