Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Low (Lobbe)

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1433AppointedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
1 Nov 1433Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
22 Apr 1444AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 1467DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Low (Lobbe):
Bishop John Low (Lobbe) (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a bishop for 34.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 71
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 567
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 224
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013