Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Knight

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1450AppointedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
14 Feb 1451Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
28 Jan 1463ResignedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
1471¹DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Knight
Bishop Thomas Knight (died 1471) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Asaph

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 72
  • ob/ln: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 90
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,451, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast